This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/06/2022 at 15:32:41 (UTC).

ADDITION FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION vs. REGISTER, MATTHEW Aet al.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 ADDITION FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against REGISTER, MATTHEW A. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L Ashton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************19-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey L Ashton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADDITION FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION

CENTRAL FLORIDA EDUCATORS FEDERAL CREDIT AKA

Defendants

MATTHEW A REGISTER

KATHERINE M REED

WEDGEFIELD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEPHEN ORSILLO

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Certificate

Certificate

Form "A"

Form "A"

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: KATHERINE M REED

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: wedgefield hoa assoc inc

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: MATTHEW A. REGISTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: wedgefield hoa assoc inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: KATHERINE M REED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: ORSILLO, STEPHEN A; Amount: -40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Sorenson Van Leuven; Amount: -905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm "A"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEDGEFIELD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTRAL FLORDIA EDUCATORS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases where ADDITION FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ORSILLO STEPHEN