This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/16/2021 at 13:32:28 (UTC).

ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY vs. PROFESSIONAL SERVICE INDUSTRIES INCet al.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2020 ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROFESSIONAL SERVICE INDUSTRIES INC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are John Marshall Kest and Jeffrey L Ashton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************63-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

John Marshall Kest

Jeffrey L Ashton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

REEDY CREEK IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT AKA

Defendants

FINFROCK DESIGN INC

INTERTEK ASSET INTEGRITY MANAGEMENT INC

FINFROCK DESIGN LLC

JR DAVIS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC

FINFROCK CONSTRUCTION INC

CONSOR ENGINEERS LLC

KELLY COLLINS AND GENTRY INC

INTERTEK INTL INC

INTERTEK TESTING SERVICES INTERNATIONAL INC

ACOMB OSTENDORF AND ASSOCIATES LLC

TARGET ENGINEERING GROUP LLC

FINFROCK INDUSTRIES LLC

INTERTEK TESTING SERVICES NA INC

FINFROCK INDUSTRIES INC

INTERTEK USA INC

INTERTEK GROUP PLC

PROFESSIONAL SERVICE INDUSTRIES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRAIG GREENE

Defendant Attorneys

DOUGLAS GARTENLAUB

AMANDA BUFFINTON

JOSE RODRIGUEZ

JENNIFER DIXON

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: by TARGET ENGINEERING GROUP, LLC and CONSOR ENGINEERS, LLC

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: by TARGET ENGINEERING GROUP, LLC and CONSOR ENGINEERS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Enlargement and Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO SERVE INITIAL PLEADING AND INITIAL PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: GREENE, CRAIG M; Amount: -140.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 140.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Kramer Green Zucherman Greene Buchsbaum PA; Amount: -430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERTEK GROUP PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where INTERTEK ASSET INTEGRITY MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant