Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/11/2021 at 22:17:20 (UTC).

ACCIDENT AND INJURY CLINIC INCvs.PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 ACCIDENT AND INJURY CLINIC INCvs PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gisela T Laurent and Carly S Wish. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************82-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gisela T Laurent

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAINEY JACKSON AAO

ACCIDENT AND INJURY CLINIC INC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

BELINDA RIVERA

 

Court Documents

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion for Summary Judgment; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice to Appear

Notice to Appear; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Marc Salpeter; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACCIDENT & INJURY CLINIC INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.