This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/21/2022 at 16:36:29 (UTC).

ACCIDENT AND INJURY CLINIC INC vs. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 ACCIDENT AND INJURY CLINIC INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy J Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************79-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ACCIDENT AND INJURY CLINIC INC

LINET COLON AAO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Addendum to

Addendum to

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACCIDENT & INJURY CLINIC INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.