This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 04/22/2023 at 15:47:56 (UTC).

ACCESS INJURY & PRIMARY CARE LLC vs. NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 ACCESS INJURY PRIMARY CARE LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Amanda S Bova. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************32-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

Judge Details

Judge

Amanda S Bova

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ACCESS INJURY & PRIMARY CARE LLC

DANIELA LAUTARU AAO

Defendant

NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

Defendant Attorney

JUSTIN CINCOLA

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less