Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/22/2021 at 15:47:17 (UTC).

ACCESS INJURY & PRIMARY CARE LLC vs. ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 ACCESS INJURY PRIMARY CARE LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************64-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ACCESS INJURY & PRIMARY CARE LLC

DAVID PEREZ AAO

Defendant

ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

Defendant Attorney

ROBYN CRAWFORD

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions; Comments: RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions; Comments: RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACCESS INJURY & PRIMARY CARE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBYN CRAWFORD