Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/26/2021 at 17:17:56 (UTC).

ACCESS INJURY & PRIMARY CARE LLC vs. USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 ACCESS INJURY PRIMARY CARE LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian F Duckworth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************66-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian F Duckworth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ACCESS INJURY & PRIMARY CARE LLC A/A/O CASILYN LEWIS

ACCESS INJURY & PRIMARY CARE LLC

CASILYN LEWIS AAO

Defendant

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

Defendant Attorney

NICHOLAS FERREIRO

 

Court Documents

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DEF

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Summons Issued

Summons Issued; Comments: emailed to attorney

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: Addendum

Notice of Compliance

Notice of Compliance; Comments: and Designation of Email Address(es)

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: (First)

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued; Comments: emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Compliance; Comments: and Designation of Email Address(es)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: (First)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACCESS INJURY & PRIMARY CARE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNON HANS