This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 16:10:45 (UTC).

ACCESS HEALTHCARE OF ORLANDO, INC. vs. ESURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 ACCESS HEALTHCARE OF ORLANDO, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ESURANCE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tina L Caraballo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************91-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tina L Caraballo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ACCESS HEALTHCARE OF ORLANDO, INC.

LINDA KUNZ AAO

Defendant

ESURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

Defendant Attorney

PHILIP COFFARO

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Privilege Log

Privilege Log

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: disclosure and designation of principal e-mail address

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: served as to ensurance property and casualty insurance company

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: disclosure and designation of principal e-mail address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: served as to ensurance property and casualty insurance company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less