This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/05/2023 at 13:29:00 (UTC).

A3MS CORPvs.OMEGA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/17/2022 A3MS CORPvs OMEGA INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************75-O

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

A3MS CORP

LUIS CASTRO AAO

Defendant

OMEGA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEO MANZANILLA

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-03

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed Issued Notice to Appear to the Attorney

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Order Following Pre-Trial Conference

Order Following Pre-Trial Conference

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: OMEGA INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: OMEGA INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Following Pre-Trial Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Chalkley, Sara (Actual: Civil, Pretrial); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial (Actual: Civil, Pretrial); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial (Actual: Civil, Pretrial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Chalkley, Sara (Actual: Civil, Pretrial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less