This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/24/2022 at 16:25:05 (UTC).

A STAR AUTO GLASS LLCvs.STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 A STAR AUTO GLASS LLCvs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian F Duckworth and Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************79-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Brian F Duckworth

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

A STAR AUTO GLASS LLC AAO RICKI LOVE

A STAR AUTO GLASS LLC

RICKI LOVE AAO

Defendants

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRUCE KAUFFMAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: ADMIN ORDER 2009-12-02

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to atty.

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request

Request; Comments: for deposition

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBIL INSURANCE COMPANY-ELECTRONIC DELIVERY- 12/21/21

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBIL INSURANCE COMPANY-ELECTRONIC DELIVERY- 12/21/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest; Comments: for deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to atty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Bruce H Kauffman; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: ADMIN ORDER 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A STAR AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant