This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 16:22:12 (UTC).

A STAR AUTO GLASS LLCvs.STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 A STAR AUTO GLASS LLCvs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy J Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************76-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

A STAR AUTO GLASS LLC AAO PETER WILSON FERRER

A STAR AUTO GLASS LLC

PETER WILSON FERRER AAO

Defendants

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRUCE KAUFFMAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: ADMIN ORDER 2009-12-02

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to atty.

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request

Request

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY- ELECTRONIC DELIVERY- 12/21/21

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY- ELECTRONIC DELIVERY- 12/21/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to atty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Bruce H Kauffman; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: ADMIN ORDER 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A STAR AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant