This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/16/2018 at 22:25:29 (UTC).

8024 CUMBERLAND PARK DRIVE APARTMENTS INVESTORS LL vs. EVERTON BATISTA GOMES VIEIRA, GREYCE BATISTA GOMES VIEIRA

Case Summary

On 09/17/2018 8024 CUMBERLAND PARK DRIVE APARTMENTS INVESTORS LL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against EVERTON BATISTA GOMES VIEIRA, GREYCE BATISTA GOMES VIEIRA. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************81-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

8024 CUMBERLAND PARK DRIVE APARTMENTS INVESTORS LL

CUMBERLAND PARK LUXURY APARTMENT HOMES DBA

Defendants

GREYCE BATISTA GOMES VIEIRA

EVERTON BATISTA GOMES VIEIRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN MCCAIN

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned Posted

Writ of Possession Returned Posted

Writ of Possession Issued

Writ of Possession Issued; Comments: emailed to atty

Final Judgment

Final Judgment

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Non Military Service; Comments: & Affidavit of Non Payment of Rent

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment; Comments: (Pltfs)

Motion for Default

Motion for Default; Comments: (Pltfs)

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: posted 9/27/18

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing; Comments: mailed to deft SASE Greyce

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing; Comments: mailed to deft SASE Everton

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Returned Posted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Non Military Service; Comments: & Affidavit of Non Payment of Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Final Judgment; Comments: (Pltfs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default; Comments: (Pltfs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served; Comments: posted 9/27/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Mailing; Comments: mailed to deft SASE Greyce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Mailing; Comments: mailed to deft SASE Everton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Exhibit(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: MCCAIN, RYAN RUFFNER; Amount: -205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN MCCAIN