This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 15:40:57 (UTC).

7M APARTMENTS LLCvs.JULIA ILLGES

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 7M APARTMENTS LLCvs JULIA ILLGES was filed as a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian F Duckworth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************01-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian F Duckworth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

7M APARTMENTS LLC

Defendant

JULIA ILLGES

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned Posted

Writ of Possession Returned Posted

Writ of Possession Issued

Writ of Possession Issued; Comments: ORIG AND COPY TO PLTF

Final Judgment

Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment; Comments: SEN TO JUDGE W/ SASE

Motion & Entry of Default on 5 Day Summons

Motion & Entry of Default on 5 Day Summons

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: original and copy to plaintiff

Complaint

Complaint; Comments: Eviction

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Posted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued; Comments: ORIG AND COPY TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Final Judgment; Comments: SEN TO JUDGE W/ SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion & Entry of Default on 5 Day Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: 7M APARTMENTS LLC; Amount: -195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: original and copy to plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Comments: Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less