Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 04/24/2021 at 22:37:57 (UTC).

2018 4 IH BORROWER LPvs.JACOB HAMBOR, MICHAEL BERUBE, SHAVIER RIOS, JAUNICE JEAN PIERRE, DAVID HAMBOR, KIMBERLY HAMBOR

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 2018 4 IH BORROWER LPvs JACOB HAMBOR, MICHAEL BERUBE, SHAVIER RIOS, JAUNICE JEAN PIERRE, DAVID HAMBOR, KIMBERLY HAMBOR was filed as a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy J Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************27-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2018 4 IH BORROWER LP

Defendants

KIMBERLY HAMBOR

MICHAEL BERUBE

DAVID HAMBOR

SHAVIER RIOS

JACOB HAMBOR

JAUNICE JEAN PIERRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL DAVIS

 

Court Documents

Motion for Hearing

Motion for Hearing; Comments: TO DETERMINE DEFENDANT S STATUS AS A COVERED PERSON UNDER THE CDC S TEMPORARY HALT IN RESIDENTIAL EVICTIONS ORDER

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ORDER UNDER SECTION 361 OF THE PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICE ACT (42 U.S.C. 264) AND 42 CODE OF FEDERAL REGULATIONS 70.2 TEMP HALT IN RESIDENTAL EVICTIONS TO PREVENT THE FURTHER SPREAD OF COVID-19- sent to judge

Answer

Answer; Comments: Michael Berube- sent to judge

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: Email sent to attorney

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: Email sent to attorney

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: Email sent to attorney

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: Email sent to attorney

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: Email sent to attorney

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: Email sent to attorney

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Hearing; Comments: TO DETERMINE DEFENDANT S STATUS AS A COVERED PERSON UNDER THE CDC S TEMPORARY HALT IN RESIDENTIAL EVICTIONS ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ORDER UNDER SECTION 361 OF THE PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICE ACT (42 U.S.C. 264) AND 42 CODE OF FEDERAL REGULATIONS 70.2 TEMP HALT IN RESIDENTAL EVICTIONS TO PREVENT THE FURTHER SPREAD OF COVID-19- sent to judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer; Comments: Michael Berube- sent to judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Mike G Davis; Amount: -247.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 247.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: Email sent to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: Email sent to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: Email sent to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: Email sent to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: Email sent to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: Email sent to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS, MICHAEL