This case was last updated from Okaloosa County Courts on 02/07/2021 at 18:37:29 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. RICH, NICHOLAS HUNTER

Case Summary

On 06/07/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RICH, NICHOLAS HUNTER. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WARD, JIM and STONE, WILLIAM F. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************47 F

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WARD, JIM

STONE, WILLIAM F

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

RICH, NICHOLAS HUNTER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • HearingEvent: CRIMINAL JURY TRIAL FELONY; Judge: STONE, WILLIAM F; Location: FWB COURTHOUSE ANNEX EXTENSION; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET DAY FELONY; Judge: STONE, WILLIAM F; Location: Courtroom 3A; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASH BOND EB-131S8Z (806.13(1B3)) FORFEITED ($750.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: STONE, WILLIAM F; Location: Courtroom 3A; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF BOND FORFEITURE - MAILED TO BOND DEPOSITOR- DONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: OCSO WARRANTS DIV SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020 CF 001247 F, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. RICH, NICHOLAS HUNTER ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: 5339-7/7/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • HearingEvent: FELONY PLEA; Judge: WARD, JIM; Location: Courtroom 1A; Result: FAILURE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: COURT RESULT: CRIMINAL JURY TRIAL FELONY SET FOR 09/21/2020 AT 9:00 AM - CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: COURT RESULT: DOCKET DAY FELONY SET FOR 09/10/2020 AT 9:00 AM - CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: COURT RESULT: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 08/26/2020 AT 9:00 AM - CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: FELONY PLEA SET FOR 07/07/2020 AT 4:10 PM IN FWB/ , JDG: WARD, JIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL JURY TRIAL FELONY SET FOR 09/21/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN FWB/ , JDG: STONE, WILLIAM F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: DOCKET DAY FELONY SET FOR 09/10/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN FWB/ , JDG: STONE, WILLIAM F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 08/26/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN FWB/ , JDG: STONE, WILLIAM F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: PROSECUTOR: IZZO, ANNE N ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARREST CHRG: 1 - (806.13(1B3)) DAMAGE PROP CRIM MISCH-OVER 1000 DOLLARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE STONE, WILLIAM F: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFENSE ATTORNEY: NO ATTORNEY ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARREST REPORT/NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/07/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 001247 F

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant