This case was last updated from Okaloosa County Courts on 02/11/2021 at 06:36:51 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. RANDOLF, JOSHUA ANDERSON

Case Summary

On 09/12/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RANDOLF, JOSHUA ANDERSON. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MASON, ANGELA D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************42 F

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MASON, ANGELA D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

RANDOLF, JOSHUA ANDERSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • HearingEvent: JURY PRE-TRIAL; Judge: MASON, ANGELA D; Location: hearing to be conducted remotely via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE CREATED AND E-SERVED TO ATTY: CHRISTOPHER WAYNE GARRETT, ATTY: EMILY L JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketEntry: JURY PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 02/11/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN ZOOM/ , JDG: MASON, ANGELA D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketEntry: COURT RESULT: JURY PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 01/14/2021 AT 9:00 AM - CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • HearingEvent: JURY PRE-TRIAL; Judge: MASON, ANGELA D; Location: hearing to be conducted remotely via Zoom; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: CLERKS MINUTE SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE CREATED AND E-SERVED TO ATTY: CHRISTOPHER WAYNE GARRETT, ATTY: EMILY L JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: JURY PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 01/14/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN FWB/ , JDG: MASON, ANGELA D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: COURT RESULT: JURY PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 12/17/2020 AT 9:00 AM - CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • HearingEvent: JURY PRE-TRIAL; Judge: MASON, ANGELA D; Location: hearing to be conducted remotely via Zoom; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: ROR BOND POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE CREATED AND E-SERVED TO ATTY: KATHRYN DEKKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGES RECORD 1ST APPEARANCE NON ADVER PROB CAUSE / ARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARREST REPORT/NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • DocketEntry: COUNTY CRIMINAL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 09/29/2020 AT 2:00 PM IN 1A/ , JDG: DAY FWB, PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARREST CHRG: 1 - (843.02) RESIST OFFICER-OBSTRUCT WO VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE MASON, ANGELA D: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • DocketEntry: PROSECUTOR: DEKKER, KATHRYN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFENSE ATTORNEY: NO ATTORNEY ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/12/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 003642 F

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant