This case was last updated from Okaloosa County Courts on 02/06/2021 at 14:30:01 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MIRE, CHRISTOPHER PATRICK

Case Summary

On 04/30/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MIRE, CHRISTOPHER PATRICK. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MASON, ANGELA D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************46 F

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MASON, ANGELA D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MIRE, CHRISTOPHER PATRICK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: JUDGE DOCKET DAY; Judge: MASON, ANGELA D; Location: hearing to be conducted remotely via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: PROSECUTOR: MOLL, MARSHALL ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketEntry: COURT RESULT: JUDGE DOCKET DAY SET FOR 12/14/2020 AT 2:00 PM - CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE CREATED AND E-SERVED TO ATTY: JOHN DAVID SNELL, ATTY: KATHRYN DEKKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE DOCKET DAY SET FOR 02/08/2021 AT 11:00 AM IN 1A/ , JDG: MASON, ANGELA D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • HearingEvent: JUDGE DOCKET DAY; Judge: MASON, ANGELA D; Location: Courtroom 1A; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: CLERKS MINUTE SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE CREATED AND E-SERVED TO ATTY: JOHN DAVID SNELL, ATTY: KATHRYN DEKKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • HearingEvent: JUDGE TRIAL; Judge: MASON, ANGELA D; Location: Courtroom 1A; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketEntry: CLERKS MINUTE SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketEntry: DOCKET DAY FELONY SET FOR 07/22/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN FWB/ , JDG: STONE, WILLIAM F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 07/15/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN FWB/ , JDG: STONE, WILLIAM F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketEntry: PROSECUTOR: IZZO, ANNE N ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARREST REPORT/NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARREST CHRG: 1 - (893.13(6A)) POSSESSION COCAINE THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARREST CHRG: 2 - (893.147(1)) NARCOTIC EQUIP POSSESS OR USE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketEntry: FELONY PLEA SET FOR 05/19/2020 AT 3:30 PM IN FWB/ , JDG: WARD, JIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE STONE, WILLIAM F: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/13/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 000823 F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFENSE ATTORNEY: NO ATTORNEY ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant