This case was last updated from Okaloosa County Courts on 02/08/2021 at 06:19:42 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MEALER, LEWIS NILES JR

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MEALER, LEWIS NILES JR. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WARD, JIM and GONTAREK, JOHN JAY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************30 F

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WARD, JIM

GONTAREK, JOHN JAY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MEALER, LEWIS NILES JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: J & S DELIVERED TO OKALOOSA COUNTY JAIL VIA EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE SUBMITTED FOR SIGNATURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketEntry: GUIDELINES SCORESHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: CORRESPONDENCE FILED FROM DOC RE: OUTSTANDING SENTENCE REQUIREMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketEntry: UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO CUSTODY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF REVOCATION OF DRUG OFFENDER PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: JAIL CREDIT MEMORANDUM - 71 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: PROSECUTOR: LEONE, ARIANNA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL JURY TRIAL FELONY SET FOR 09/14/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN FWB/ , JDG: GONTAREK, JOHN JAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: DOCKET DAY FELONY SET FOR 09/10/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN FWB/ , JDG: GONTAREK, JOHN JAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 09/03/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN FWB/ , JDG: GONTAREK, JOHN JAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: FELONY PLEA SET FOR 07/21/2020 AT 4:10 PM IN FWB/ , JDG: WARD, JIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARREST CHRG: 1 - (893.13(6A)) DRUGS POSSESS-CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WITHOUT PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARREST CHRG: 2 - (893.147(1)) NARCOTIC EQUIP POSSESS OR USE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE GONTAREK, JOHN JAY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFENSE ATTORNEY: NO ATTORNEY ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/24/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 001430 F

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant