This case was last updated from Okaloosa County Courts on 09/16/2022 at 17:08:29 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. LITTLE, JOSHUA MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 08/19/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LITTLE, JOSHUA MICHAEL. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POLSON, MARY K and BROWN, JOHN T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************44 F

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POLSON, MARY K

BROWN, JOHN T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

LITTLE, JOSHUA MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GATES, TRAVIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: BROWN, JOHN T; Location: FWB COURTHOUSE ANNEX EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • HearingEvent: FELONY PLEA; Judge: BROWN, JOHN T; Location: FWB COURTHOUSE ANNEX EXTENSION; Result: NOT GUILTY PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: POWELL, GILLIS E III SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022 CF 002144 F, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. LITTLE, JOSHUA MICHAEL ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: NCI-9/7/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE/FORM CREATED ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: COURT RESULT: FELONY PLEA SET FOR 09/22/2022 AT 1:30 PM - NOT GUILTY PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFENSE ATTORNEY: POWELL, GILLIS E III ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: PROSECUTOR: REED, CASSIE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketEntry: SIGNATURE BOND POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE CREATED AND E-SERVED TO ATTY: TAYLOR D SHARPLESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/14/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN FWB/ , JDG: BROWN, JOHN T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: FELONY PLEA SET FOR 09/22/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN FWB/ , JDG: BROWN, JOHN T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: PROSECUTOR: SHARPLESS, TAYLOR D ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: ARREST REPORT/NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: ARREST CHRG: 1 - (893.13(6A)) POSSESSION COCAINE THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE BROWN, JOHN T: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/19/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CF 002144 F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFENSE ATTORNEY: NO ATTORNEY ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GATES, TRAVIS