This case was last updated from Okaloosa County Courts on 01/04/2022 at 18:03:47 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. COLVIN, DEBRA KAY

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against COLVIN, DEBRA KAY. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POLSON, MARY K, GONTAREK, JOHN JAY and WARD, JIM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************56 F

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POLSON, MARY K

GONTAREK, JOHN JAY

WARD, JIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

COLVIN, DEBRA KAY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: POLSON, MARY K; Location: FWB COURTHOUSE ANNEX EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEntry: MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • HearingEvent: CHANGE OF PLEA; Judge: GONTAREK, JOHN JAY; Location: Courtroom 3A; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: COURT RESULT: CHANGE OF PLEA SET FOR 12/16/2021 AT 9:00 AM - CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE CANCEL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • HearingEvent: FELONY PLEA; Judge: WARD, JIM; Location: Courtroom 1A; Result: NOT GUILTY PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE CREATED AND E-SERVED TO ATTY: STEVEN ARNOLD MEDINA, DEF: DEBRA KAY COLVIN, ATTY: MICHELLE SANDLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEntry: CHANGE OF PLEA SET FOR 12/16/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A/ , JDG: GONTAREK, JOHN JAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: MEDINA, STEVEN ARNOLD SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021 CF 002856 F, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. COLVIN, DEBRA KAY ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: NCI-11/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE/FORM CREATED ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 02/14/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN FWB/ , JDG: POLSON, MARY K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE CREATED AND E-SERVED TO DEF: DEBRA KAY COLVIN, ATTY: MICHELLE SANDLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: PROSECUTOR: SANDLER, MICHELLE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: ARREST REPORT/NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: FELONY PLEA SET FOR 12/07/2021 AT 3:30 PM IN FWB/ , JDG: WARD, JIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: ARREST CHRG: 1 - (812.014(2C1)) LARC - GRAND THEFT 750 LESS THAN 5K DOLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE GONTAREK, JOHN JAY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/05/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CF 002856 F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: DEFENSE ATTORNEY: NO ATTORNEY ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant