This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 05/19/2022 at 07:05:04 (UTC).

WORLEY, JILL ANNE, WORLEY, RAY Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 WORLEY, JILL ANNE, WORLEY, RAY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITE, REBECCA IVY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WORLEY, RAY

Decedent

WORLEY, JILL ANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Decedent Attorney

FADLEY, JEFFREY ALLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER APPOINTING TRANSFER OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketRECORDED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketRECORDED NOTICE OF FILING LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF JILL ANNE WORELY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketOATH DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER APPROVING TRANSFER OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 110336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCase 472021CP000257CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FADLEY, JEFFREY ALLEN