This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 10/28/2021 at 04:18:46 (UTC).

WOLFF, JACK D, WOLFF, OPAL A Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 WOLFF, JACK D, WOLFF, OPAL A was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITE, REBECCA IVY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

 

Party Details

Decedent

WOLFF, JACK D

Trustee

WOLFF, OPAL A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Trustee Attorney

BERES, STEVEN D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $41.00 Receipt Number MX 106718

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $41.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCase 472021CP000141CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERES, STEVEN D