This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 11/13/2021 at 18:07:55 (UTC).

WILLIAMS, FREDERICK VS SPANGLER, CAITLIN BERNICE

Case Summary

On 07/12/2016 WILLIAMS, FREDERICK filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against SPANGLER, CAITLIN BERNICE. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HEISEY, MICHAEL CARLTON and TERRY SLUSHER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HEISEY, MICHAEL CARLTON

TERRY SLUSHER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILLIAMS, FREDERICK

Respondent

SPANGLER, CAITLIN BERNICE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketORDER UPON RECOMMENDED ORDER ON MOTHER'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT / ENFORCEMENT FILED 3/24/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketMAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS TO CIRCUIT JUDGE ON FATHER' MOTION FOR CIVIL CONTEMPT/ENFORCEMENT FILED 7/10/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketEvent DOMESTIC REL HRG scheduled on 5/22/2018 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge TERRY SLUSHER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketORDER NOTICE OF HEARING SCHEDULED BEFORE THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE 5/22/2018 AT 9 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONCLUSION OF REPRESENTATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketMOTION FOR CIVIL CONTEMPT / ENFORCEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketFAMILY COURT COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketNOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketPETITION TO ESTABLISH PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITY AND TIMESHARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketDISCLAIMER AND NOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketPayment received: $10.50 Receipt Number MX 50773

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $10.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketCase 472016DR000294DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/12/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less