This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 07/31/2019 at 14:01:09 (UTC).

WAGNER, DEBORAH VS ASHMORE, OTIS RICKY

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 WAGNER, DEBORAH filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ASHMORE, OTIS RICKY. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAGNER, DEBORAH

Defendant

ASHMORE, OTIS RICKY

Not Classified By Court

ASHMORE, OTIS R

ASHMORE, OTIS

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING STATUS HEARING ON AUGUST 1, 2019 AT 11:15 A.M.

07/19/2019:ORDER SETTING STATUS HEARING ON AUGUST 1, 2019 AT 11:15 A.M.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($625.00)

07/12/2019:CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($625.00)

RESPONSIVE PLEADING (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

07/09/2019:RESPONSIVE PLEADING (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED (POSTED) 7/2/2019 ON OTIS RICKY ASHMORE

07/08/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED (POSTED) 7/2/2019 ON OTIS RICKY ASHMORE

CERTIFICATE OF DISTRIBUTION/MAILING

07/01/2019:CERTIFICATE OF DISTRIBUTION/MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED TO OTIS RICKY ASHMORE

07/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO OTIS RICKY ASHMORE

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

07/01/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/01/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • Event COUNTY CIVIL HEARING scheduled on 8/1/2019 at 1115 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING STATUS HEARING ON AUGUST 1, 2019 AT 11:15 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($625.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Payment received: $643.00 Receipt Number MX 86413

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $643.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSIVE PLEADING (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED (POSTED) 7/2/2019 ON OTIS RICKY ASHMORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number MX 86077

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO OTIS RICKY ASHMORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Case 472019CC000156CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Event Date: 08/01/2019 11:15; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: STATUS REVIEW; Location: MX COURTROOM D

    Read MoreRead Less