This case was last updated from Okeechobee County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/04/2022 at 13:34:02 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS JONES, ROBERT L Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JONES, ROBERT L. This case was filed in Okeechobee County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITE, REBECCA IVY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

JONES, ROBERT L

ROBERT L JONES, UNKNOWN SPOUSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

Defendant Attorney

ENGVALSON, KINLEY I

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/05/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

05/05/2022:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

05/05/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MROTGAGE

05/05/2022:COMPLAINT VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MROTGAGE

NOTICE OF SUBMITTING CERTIFICATION

05/05/2022:NOTICE OF SUBMITTING CERTIFICATION

SUMMONS TO ROBERT L JONES (PROPOSED)

05/05/2022:SUMMONS TO ROBERT L JONES (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT L JONES (PROPOSED)

05/05/2022:SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT L JONES (PROPOSED)

AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER (STANDARD TRACK) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

05/05/2022:AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER (STANDARD TRACK) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBERT L JONES

05/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBERT L JONES

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT L JONES

05/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT L JONES

AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT L JONES NOT SERVED

05/19/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT L JONES NOT SERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - ROBERT L JONES SERVED SUBSTITUTE 5/13/2022

05/19/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - ROBERT L JONES SERVED SUBSTITUTE 5/13/2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE , LEAD COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

05/25/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE , LEAD COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

05/25/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

AGREED ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

06/03/2022:AGREED ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE , LEAD COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - ROBERT L JONES SERVED SUBSTITUTE 5/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT L JONES NOT SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO UNNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT L JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBERT L JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER (STANDARD TRACK) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT L JONES (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO ROBERT L JONES (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBMITTING CERTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MROTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $925.00 Receipt Number MX 116574

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $925.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCase 472022CA000104CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/5/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan