This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 10/31/2019 at 23:01:00 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR LLC VS ORIHUELA, DEBORAH A

Case Summary

On 10/07/2019 UNIFUND CCR LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ORIHUELA, DEBORAH A. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR LLC

Defendant

ORIHUELA, DEBORAH A

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, JEFFREY LEE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE ISSUED DEBORAH A ORIHUELA

10/07/2019:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE ISSUED DEBORAH A ORIHUELA

SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE DEBORAH A ORIHUELA (PROPOSED)

10/07/2019:SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE DEBORAH A ORIHUELA (PROPOSED)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/07/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

10/07/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/07/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE ISSUED DEBORAH A ORIHUELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 1/16/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE DEBORAH A ORIHUELA (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 89486

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Case 472019SC000283SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/7/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Event Date: 01/16/2020 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX COURTROOM D

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIFUND CCR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAHN, JEFFREY LEE