This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 09/10/2020 at 12:23:28 (UTC).

TOTAL ROADSIDE SERVICE LLC VS DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 TOTAL ROADSIDE SERVICE LLC filed an Other lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM J, WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM J

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOTAL ROADSIDE SERVICE LLC

Defendants

DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY

DOE, JOHN

 

Court Documents

RECORDED DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

03/17/2020:RECORDED DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

COURT NOTES

03/10/2020:COURT NOTES

ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

02/26/2020:ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

01/24/2020:COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/10/2020 09:30; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: COUNTY CIVIL HEARING; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketEvent COUNTY CIVIL HEARING scheduled on 3/10/2020 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $300.00 Receipt Number MX 93249

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCase 472020CC000017CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY A is a litigant