This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 02/01/2021 at 12:13:10 (UTC).

TINDALL, LAURA JANE VS AIELLO, JULIA Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 TINDALL, LAURA JANE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against AIELLO, JULIA. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM J and WALLACE, WILLIAM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM J

WALLACE, WILLIAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TINDALL, LAURA JANE

Defendants

AIELLO, JULIA

VASQUEZ, MESHELE

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL SENT TO JULIA AIELLO (FINAL JUDGMENT - EVICTION)

03/31/2020:RETURNED MAIL SENT TO JULIA AIELLO (FINAL JUDGMENT - EVICTION)

RETURNED MAIL SENT TO MECHELE VASQUEZ (FINAL JUDGMENT-EVICTION)

03/31/2020:RETURNED MAIL SENT TO MECHELE VASQUEZ (FINAL JUDGMENT-EVICTION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED

03/12/2020:WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED

WRIT OF POSSESSION

03/06/2020:WRIT OF POSSESSION

RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT - EVICTION

03/05/2020:RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT - EVICTION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - RESIDENTIAL EVICTION (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

02/19/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - RESIDENTIAL EVICTION (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT - RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

02/19/2020:MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT - RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

02/19/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

EVICTION SUMMONS RESIDENTIAL RETURNED SERVED (POSTED) 2/10/2020 ON MICHELE VASQUEZ

02/12/2020:EVICTION SUMMONS RESIDENTIAL RETURNED SERVED (POSTED) 2/10/2020 ON MICHELE VASQUEZ

EVICTION SUMMONS RESIDENTIAL RETURNED SERVED (POSTED) 2/10/2020 ON JULIA AIELO

02/12/2020:EVICTION SUMMONS RESIDENTIAL RETURNED SERVED (POSTED) 2/10/2020 ON JULIA AIELO

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING MESHELE VASQUEZ

02/06/2020:CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING MESHELE VASQUEZ

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING JULIA AIELLO

02/06/2020:CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING JULIA AIELLO

SUMMONS ISSUED MESHELE VASQUEZ

02/06/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED MESHELE VASQUEZ

SUMMONS ISSUED JULIA AIELLO

02/06/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED JULIA AIELLO

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

02/06/2020:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/06/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL SENT TO JULIA AIELLO (FINAL JUDGMENT - EVICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL SENT TO MECHELE VASQUEZ (FINAL JUDGMENT-EVICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT - EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - RESIDENTIAL EVICTION (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT - RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS RESIDENTIAL RETURNED SERVED (POSTED) 2/10/2020 ON MICHELE VASQUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING MESHELE VASQUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING JULIA AIELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $205.00 Receipt Number MX 93732

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED MESHELE VASQUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JULIA AIELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCase 472020CC000035CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/6/2020

    Read MoreRead Less