This case was last updated from Okeechobee County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/29/2022 at 13:36:47 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON VS IN POSSESSION 1, UNKNOWN TENAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against IN POSSESSION 1, UNKNOWN TENAN. This case was filed in Okeechobee County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITE, REBECCA IVY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendants

INDIAN HAMMOCK HUNT AND RIDING

O CONNOR, THEODORE J

O CONNOR, REBECCA I

IN POSSESSION 1, UNKNOWN TENAN

IN POSSESSION 2, UNKNOWN TENAN

Not Classified By Court

CONNOR, THEODORE O

CONNOR, REBECCA O

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS, SARA BETH

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO INDIAN HAMMOCK HUNT AND RIDING CLCUB INC, C/O COREY MILLER ON 05/10/2022

05/18/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO INDIAN HAMMOCK HUNT AND RIDING CLCUB INC, C/O COREY MILLER ON 05/10/2022

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO REBECCA I O'CONNOR A/K/A REBECCA O'CONNOR ON 05/09/2022

05/16/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO REBECCA I O'CONNOR A/K/A REBECCA O'CONNOR ON 05/09/2022

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO THEODORE J O'CONNOR A/K/A THEODORE O'CONNOR SUBSERVED TO REBECCA O'CONNOR ON 05/09/2022

05/16/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO THEODORE J O'CONNOR A/K/A THEODORE O'CONNOR SUBSERVED TO REBECCA O'CONNOR ON 05/09/2022

AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION #2

05/16/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION #2

AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

05/16/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

05/03/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

05/03/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

SUMMONS ISSUED TO INDIAN HAMMOCK HUNT AND RIDING CLUB INC CO COREY MILLER

05/03/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO INDIAN HAMMOCK HUNT AND RIDING CLUB INC CO COREY MILLER

SUMMONS ISSUED TO REBECCA I O'CONNOR AKA REBECCA O'CONNOR

05/03/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO REBECCA I O'CONNOR AKA REBECCA O'CONNOR

SUMMONS ISSUED TO THEODORE J O'CONNOR AKA THEODORE O'CONNOR

05/03/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO THEODORE J O'CONNOR AKA THEODORE O'CONNOR

SUMMONS TO THEODORE J O'CONNOR AKA THEODORE O'CONNOR (PROPOSED

05/03/2022:SUMMONS TO THEODORE J O'CONNOR AKA THEODORE O'CONNOR (PROPOSED

SUMMONS TO REBECCA I O'CONNOR AKA REBECCA O'CONNOR (PROPOSED)

05/03/2022:SUMMONS TO REBECCA I O'CONNOR AKA REBECCA O'CONNOR (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO INDIAN HAMMOCK HUNT AND RIDING CLUB INC CO COREY MILLER (PROPOSED)

05/03/2022:SUMMONS TO INDIAN HAMMOCK HUNT AND RIDING CLUB INC CO COREY MILLER (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 (PROPOSED)

05/03/2022:SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2 (PROPOSED)

05/03/2022:SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2 (PROPOSED)

AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER (STANDARD TRACK) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER (PROPOSED)

05/03/2022:AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER (STANDARD TRACK) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER (PROPOSED)

NOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

05/03/2022:NOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

05/03/2022:NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO INDIAN HAMMOCK HUNT AND RIDING CLCUB INC, C/O COREY MILLER ON 05/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO REBECCA I O'CONNOR A/K/A REBECCA O'CONNOR ON 05/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO THEODORE J O'CONNOR A/K/A THEODORE O'CONNOR SUBSERVED TO REBECCA O'CONNOR ON 05/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO INDIAN HAMMOCK HUNT AND RIDING CLUB INC CO COREY MILLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO REBECCA I O'CONNOR AKA REBECCA O'CONNOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO THEODORE J O'CONNOR AKA THEODORE O'CONNOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $1,960.00 Receipt Number MX 116449

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $1,960.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCase 472022CA000099CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARA B COLLINS, ESQ