This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 10/14/2021 at 04:45:58 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS HUNNICUTT, LISA

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HUNNICUTT, LISA. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM J, WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM J

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

HUNNICUTT, LISA

Okeechobee, FL 34974

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/24/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/24/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO LISA HUNNICUTT (PROPOSED)

02/24/2021:SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO LISA HUNNICUTT (PROPOSED)

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

02/24/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO LISA HUNNICUTT

02/24/2021:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO LISA HUNNICUTT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 3/2/2021 ON LISA HUNNICUTT

03/03/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 3/2/2021 ON LISA HUNNICUTT

PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

03/18/2021:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/18/2021 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER COURTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 3/2/2021 ON LISA HUNNICUTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO LISA HUNNICUTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 3/18/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO LISA HUNNICUTT (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCase 472021SC000047SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 103148

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J