This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 02/01/2021 at 12:13:16 (UTC).

SMITH, AIRIANA NUNEZ VS CREAMER, JAY

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 SMITH, AIRIANA NUNEZ filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CREAMER, JAY. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM J, WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM J

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH, AIRIANA NUNEZ

Defendant

CREAMER, JAY

 

Court Documents

COURT NOTES

08/12/2020:COURT NOTES

RETURNED MAIL SENT TO JAY CREAMER OF ORDER RESETTING HEARING

07/13/2020:RETURNED MAIL SENT TO JAY CREAMER OF ORDER RESETTING HEARING

RETURNED MAIL SENT TO JAY CREAMER - ORDER RESETTING HEARING

06/23/2020:RETURNED MAIL SENT TO JAY CREAMER - ORDER RESETTING HEARING

ORDER RESETTING HEARING

06/12/2020:ORDER RESETTING HEARING

RETURNED MAIL SENT TO ORDER RESETTING HEARING - JAY CREAMER

05/06/2020:RETURNED MAIL SENT TO ORDER RESETTING HEARING - JAY CREAMER

ORDER RESETTING HEARING

04/24/2020:ORDER RESETTING HEARING

RETURNED MAIL SENT TO JAY CREAMER - ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING

04/15/2020:RETURNED MAIL SENT TO JAY CREAMER - ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING

RETURNED MAIL SENT TO JAY CREAMER - ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING

04/06/2020:RETURNED MAIL SENT TO JAY CREAMER - ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING

ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING

04/01/2020:ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING

RETURNED MAIL SENT TO JAY CREAMER (ORDER SETTING HEARING)

03/31/2020:RETURNED MAIL SENT TO JAY CREAMER (ORDER SETTING HEARING)

RETURNED MAIL SENT TO JAY CREAMER (ORDER SETTING REHEARING)

03/31/2020:RETURNED MAIL SENT TO JAY CREAMER (ORDER SETTING REHEARING)

ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING DATE

03/23/2020:ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING DATE

ORDER SETTING HEARING

03/17/2020:ORDER SETTING HEARING

RESPONSIVE PLEADING (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

02/28/2020:RESPONSIVE PLEADING (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

EVICTION SUMMONS RESIDENTIAL RETURNED SERVED 2/24/2020 ON JAY CREAMER

02/25/2020:EVICTION SUMMONS RESIDENTIAL RETURNED SERVED 2/24/2020 ON JAY CREAMER

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/21/2020:CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED JAY CREAMER

02/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED JAY CREAMER

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

02/21/2020:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 08/11/2020 10:45; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: COUNTY CIVIL HEARING; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 07/14/2020 09:15; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: COUNTY CIVIL HEARING; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL SENT TO JAY CREAMER OF ORDER RESETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketEvent COUNTY CIVIL HEARING scheduled on 8/11/2020 at 1045 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RESETTING HEARING TO 8/11/2020 AT 10:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL SENT TO JAY CREAMER - ORDER RESETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 06/16/2020 11:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: COUNTY CIVIL HEARING; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketEvent COUNTY CIVIL HEARING scheduled on 7/14/2020 at 0915 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSIVE PLEADING (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS RESIDENTIAL RETURNED SERVED 2/24/2020 ON JAY CREAMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number MX 94247

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JAY CREAMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCase 472020CC000055CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less