This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 11/19/2021 at 22:03:01 (UTC).

SKINNER, ROBERT W VS SKINNER, WENDY S

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 SKINNER, ROBERT W filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SKINNER, WENDY S. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITE, REBECCA IVY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SKINNER, ROBERT W

Respondent

SKINNER, WENDY S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FADLEY, JEFFREY ALLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF FLORIDA CDL - WENDY SKINNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION AND COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $37.00 Receipt Number MX 110966

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 4 assessed at sum $23.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $403.00

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF STANDARD FAMILY LAW INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF W/ STANDING ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number MX 110418

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCase 472021DR000384DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FADLEY, JEFFREY ALLEN