This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 07/26/2019 at 14:00:58 (UTC).

SILBERT, DEBRA VS GARDNER, TAMI Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/26/2019 SILBERT, DEBRA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GARDNER, TAMI. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALLACE, WILLIAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALLACE, WILLIAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SILBERT, DEBRA

Defendants

MALOY, BRANDON

GARDNER, TAMI

 

Court Documents

EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED (POSTED) 7/2/2019 ON BRANDON MALOY

07/08/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED (POSTED) 7/2/2019 ON BRANDON MALOY

EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED (POSTED) 7/2/2019 ON TAMI GARDNER

07/08/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED (POSTED) 7/2/2019 ON TAMI GARDNER

SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRANDON MALOY

06/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRANDON MALOY

SUMMONS ISSUED TO TAMI GARDNER

06/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO TAMI GARDNER

SUMMONS EVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL TO BRANDON MALOY (PROPOSED)

06/28/2019:SUMMONS EVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL TO BRANDON MALOY (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS EVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL TO TAMI GARDNER (PROPOSED)

06/28/2019:SUMMONS EVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL TO TAMI GARDNER (PROPOSED)

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

06/28/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED (POSTED) 7/2/2019 ON BRANDON MALOY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED (POSTED) 7/2/2019 ON TAMI GARDNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRANDON MALOY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO TAMI GARDNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS EVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL TO BRANDON MALOY (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS EVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL TO TAMI GARDNER (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Payment received: $205.00 Receipt Number MX 86037

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Case 472019CC000154CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less