This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 07/26/2019 at 23:00:47 (UTC).

SECOND ROUND LP ASSIGNEE OF SY VS PETHYBRIDGE, TERRIEA

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 SECOND ROUND LP ASSIGNEE OF SY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PETHYBRIDGE, TERRIEA. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECOND ROUND LP ASSIGNEE OF SY

Defendant

PETHYBRIDGE, TERRIEA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 7/11/2019 ON TERRIEA PETHYBRIDGE

07/12/2019:SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 7/11/2019 ON TERRIEA PETHYBRIDGE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO TERRIEA PETHYBRIDGE

07/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO TERRIEA PETHYBRIDGE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

07/02/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/02/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO TERRIEA PETHYBRIDGE (PROPOSED)

07/02/2019:SUMMONS TO TERRIEA PETHYBRIDGE (PROPOSED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 7/11/2019 ON TERRIEA PETHYBRIDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO TERRIEA PETHYBRIDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 8/15/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 86251

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO TERRIEA PETHYBRIDGE (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Case 472019SC000172SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Event Date: 08/15/2019 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX COURTROOM D

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECOND ROUND SUB LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK J.CREW is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daley, Sarah C