This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 05/27/2022 at 05:25:51 (UTC).

SCRUGGS, JUDY DIANNE VS DEES, THOMAS LYN

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 SCRUGGS, JUDY DIANNE filed an Other lawsuit against DEES, THOMAS LYN. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM, WALLACE, WILLIAM J and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WALLACE, WILLIAM J

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCRUGGS, JUDY DIANNE

Defendant

DEES, THOMAS LYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SNEIDER, GLENN JEFFRY

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE

01/03/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

12/21/2021:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

WRIT OF POSSESSION (PROPOSED)

12/21/2021:WRIT OF POSSESSION (PROPOSED)

RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION DUE TO UNLAWFUL DETENTION

12/20/2021:RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION DUE TO UNLAWFUL DETENTION

COURT NOTES

12/16/2021:COURT NOTES

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO COUNTERCLAIM OF DEFENDANT

12/16/2021:PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO COUNTERCLAIM OF DEFENDANT

DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO FINAL HEARING, SECOND REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFECTIVE COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

12/15/2021:DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO FINAL HEARING, SECOND REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFECTIVE COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/07/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND PROPOSED DEFAULT

12/01/2021:MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND PROPOSED DEFAULT

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON THOMAS DEES - SERVED 11/19/2021

12/01/2021:NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON THOMAS DEES - SERVED 11/19/2021

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER AND UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

12/01/2021:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER AND UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT, COUNTER CLAIM AND MOTION TO DISMISS (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

12/01/2021:DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT, COUNTER CLAIM AND MOTION TO DISMISS (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

SUMMONS UNLAWFUL DETAINER SUMMONS TO THOMAS DEE

11/19/2021:SUMMONS UNLAWFUL DETAINER SUMMONS TO THOMAS DEE

UNLAWFUL DETAINER SUMMONS TO THOMAS DEE (PROPOSED)

11/19/2021:UNLAWFUL DETAINER SUMMONS TO THOMAS DEE (PROPOSED)

NOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

11/19/2021:NOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

11/19/2021:COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/19/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/19/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION DUE TO UNLAWFUL DETENTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/16/2021 09:30; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: COUNTY CIVIL HEARING; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER COURTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO COUNTERCLAIM OF DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO FINAL HEARING, SECOND REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFECTIVE COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent COUNTY CIVIL HEARING scheduled on 12/16/2021 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT, COUNTER CLAIM AND MOTION TO DISMISS (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNLAWFUL DETAINER SUMMONS TO THOMAS DEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER SUMMONS TO THOMAS DEE (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 111305

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCase 472021CC000299CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNEIDER, GLENN JEFFRY