This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 11/19/2021 at 23:14:40 (UTC).

RTO NATIONAL LLC VS WOOD, WILLIAM

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 RTO NATIONAL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WOOD, WILLIAM. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM, WILLIAM WALLACE and WALLACE, WILLIAM J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

WALLACE, WILLIAM J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RTO NATIONAL LLC

Defendant

WOOD, WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/20/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM REPLEVIN ACTION/ALTERNATIVELY CLAIM FOR DAMAGES

10/20/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM REPLEVIN ACTION/ALTERNATIVELY CLAIM FOR DAMAGES

MOTION FOR PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR REMOTELY

10/20/2021:MOTION FOR PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR REMOTELY

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

10/20/2021:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

CORPORATE AUTHORIZATION

10/20/2021:CORPORATE AUTHORIZATION

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

10/20/2021:DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO WILLIAM WOOD

10/20/2021:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO WILLIAM WOOD

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR REMOTELY - DENIED

11/05/2021:ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR REMOTELY - DENIED

SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED NOT FOUND, NO PHYSICAL RESIDENCE FOUND ON PROPERTY, UNABLE TO LOCATE

11/10/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED NOT FOUND, NO PHYSICAL RESIDENCE FOUND ON PROPERTY, UNABLE TO LOCATE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

11/11/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

RETURNED MAIL SENT TO WILLIAM WOOD - ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR REMOTELY

11/19/2021:RETURNED MAIL SENT TO WILLIAM WOOD - ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR REMOTELY

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/07/2021 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL SENT TO WILLIAM WOOD - ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR REMOTELY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED NOT FOUND, NO PHYSICAL RESIDENCE FOUND ON PROPERTY, UNABLE TO LOCATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR REMOTELY - DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $395.00 Receipt Number MX 110415

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 12/7/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO WILLIAM WOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE AUTHORIZATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR REMOTELY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM REPLEVIN ACTION/ALTERNATIVELY CLAIM FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCase 472021SC000321SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RTO NATIONAL LLC is a litigant