This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 12/20/2019 at 23:00:44 (UTC).

RTO NATIONAL LLC VS BYARS, KRYSTAL

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 RTO NATIONAL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BYARS, KRYSTAL. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RTO NATIONAL LLC

Defendant

BYARS, KRYSTAL

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

12/06/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

NOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

12/06/2019:NOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

RETURN OF SERVICE - KRYSTAL BYARS SERVED SUBSTITUTE 12/9/2019

12/18/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - KRYSTAL BYARS SERVED SUBSTITUTE 12/9/2019

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE ISSUED TO KRYSTAL BYARS

12/06/2019:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE ISSUED TO KRYSTAL BYARS

AUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER

12/06/2019:AUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER

STATEMENT OF CLAIM REPLEVIN ACTION/ALTERNATIVELY CLAIM FOR DAMAGES

12/06/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM REPLEVIN ACTION/ALTERNATIVELY CLAIM FOR DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - KRYSTAL BYARS SERVED SUBSTITUTE 12/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $402.00 Receipt Number MX 91669

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE ISSUED TO KRYSTAL BYARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM REPLEVIN ACTION/ALTERNATIVELY CLAIM FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 12/27/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 4 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase 472019SC000325SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/27/2019 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX COURTROOM D

    Read MoreRead Less