This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 05/19/2022 at 07:13:50 (UTC).

ROBINSON, JAMES D, TRAPP, CINDY L Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 ROBINSON, JAMES D, TRAPP, CINDY L was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITE, REBECCA IVY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TRAPP, CINDY L

Decedent

ROBINSON, JAMES D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

D'ADDARIO, ANDREA CHRISTINE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketRECEIPT OF INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketINVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketRECORDED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketRECORDED LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 111680

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCase 472021CP000287CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer D'ADDARIO, ANDREA