This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 10/17/2019 at 23:01:40 (UTC).

RICHARDS, CATHERINE VS TREMAIN, DEREK

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 RICHARDS, CATHERINE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TREMAIN, DEREK. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARDS, CATHERINE

Defendant

TREMAIN, DEREK

Not Classified By Court

RICHARDS, CATHERINE ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 9/24/2019 ON DEREK TREMAIN

09/27/2019:NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 9/24/2019 ON DEREK TREMAIN

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED DEREK TREMAIN

09/23/2019:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED DEREK TREMAIN

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/23/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 9/24/2019 ON DEREK TREMAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Payment received: $315.50 Receipt Number MX 88913

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 10/17/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED DEREK TREMAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Assessment 4 assessed at sum $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $3.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Case 472019SC000262SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Event Date: 10/17/2019 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX COURTROOM D

    Read MoreRead Less