This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 10/14/2021 at 04:45:52 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS PATRICK, LISA

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PATRICK, LISA. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM J, WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM J

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

PATRICK, LISA

Okeechobee, FL 34974

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

Defendant Attorney

CASTELLANOS, J NICHOLAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/24/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/24/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO LISA PATRICK (PROPOSED)

02/24/2021:SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO LISA PATRICK (PROPOSED)

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

02/24/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO LISA PATRICK

02/24/2021:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO LISA PATRICK

AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE - LISA PATRICK NON SERVED

03/12/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE - LISA PATRICK NON SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

03/12/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

03/18/2021:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

09/13/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/18/2021 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER COURTR; Defendant Attorney: CASTELLANOS, J. NICHOLAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE - LISA PATRICK NON SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO LISA PATRICK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 3/18/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO LISA PATRICK (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCase 472021SC000048SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 103149

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASTELLANOS , J NICHOLAS