This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 10/28/2019 at 23:00:30 (UTC).

PLATT CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC VS BLACKWOOD, EVA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 PLATT CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BLACKWOOD, EVA. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PLATT CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC

Defendant

BLACKWOOD, EVA

 

Court Documents

ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE (AS TO DATE ONLY)

10/22/2019:ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE (AS TO DATE ONLY)

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SUBSERVED TO CALEB HOFER FOR EVA BLACKWOOD 10/7/2019

10/10/2019:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SUBSERVED TO CALEB HOFER FOR EVA BLACKWOOD 10/7/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORITY

10/04/2019:STATEMENT OF AUTHORITY

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE ISSUED TO EVA BLACKWOOD

10/04/2019:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE ISSUED TO EVA BLACKWOOD

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/04/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 1/16/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE (AS TO DATE ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SUBSERVED TO CALEB HOFER FOR EVA BLACKWOOD 10/7/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Payment received: $97.00 Receipt Number MX 89399

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE ISSUED TO EVA BLACKWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 12/12/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Case 472019SC000278SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Event Date: 01/16/2020 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX COURTROOM D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Event Date: 12/12/2019 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX COURTROOM D

    Read MoreRead Less