This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Okeechobee County on 10/20/2019 at 13:30:59 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS ASHELY, JUANITA J Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ASHELY, JUANITA J. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Okeechobee County, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTIN

UNKNOWN PARTY 1

UNKNOWN PARTY 4

ASHELY, JUANITA J

UNKNOWN PARTY 3

UNKNOWN PARTY 2

Not Classified By Court

CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

ASHLEY, J. JOYCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDHARDT, CHRISTOPHER CHARLES

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/NON SERVICE UNKNOWN PARTY #2

10/15/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/NON SERVICE UNKNOWN PARTY #2

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/NON SERVICE UNKNOWN PARTY #1

10/15/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/NON SERVICE UNKNOWN PARTY #1

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/NON SERVICE RETURN OF SERVICE ON UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT 10/8/2019

10/15/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/NON SERVICE RETURN OF SERVICE ON UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT 10/8/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/NON SERVICE ON JUANITA J ASHELY A/K/A J. JOYCE ASHLEY 10/12/2019

10/15/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/NON SERVICE ON JUANITA J ASHELY A/K/A J. JOYCE ASHLEY 10/12/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN PARTY #2

09/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN PARTY #2

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN PARTY #1

09/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN PARTY #1

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JUANITA J ASHLEY AKA J JOYCE ASHLEY

09/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JUANITA J ASHLEY AKA J JOYCE ASHLEY

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, SOUTHERN DISTRICT C/O US ATTORNEY

09/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, SOUTHERN DISTRICT C/O US ATTORNEY

SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN PARTY #2 (PROPOSED)

09/23/2019:SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN PARTY #2 (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN PARTY #1 (PROPOSED)

09/23/2019:SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN PARTY #1 (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO JUANITA J ASHLEY AKA J JOYCE ASHLEY (PROPOSED)

09/23/2019:SUMMONS TO JUANITA J ASHLEY AKA J JOYCE ASHLEY (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, SOUTHERN DISTRICT C/O US ATTORNEY (PROPOSED)

09/23/2019:SUMMONS TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, SOUTHERN DISTRICT C/O US ATTORNEY (PROPOSED)

PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT JUANITA J ASHLEY

09/23/2019:PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT JUANITA J ASHLEY

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT JUANITA J ASHLEY

09/23/2019:PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT JUANITA J ASHLEY

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

09/23/2019:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

09/23/2019:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

09/23/2019:VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/23/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE UNKNOWN PARTY #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE UNKNOWN PARTY #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE ON UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT 10/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON JUANITA J ASHELY A/K/A J. JOYCE ASHLEY 10/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN PARTY #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN PARTY #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO JUANITA J ASHLEY AKA J JOYCE ASHLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, SOUTHERN DISTRICT C/O US ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN PARTY #2 (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN PARTY #1 (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, SOUTHERN DISTRICT C/O US ATTORNEY (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT JUANITA J ASHLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT JUANITA J ASHLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Payment received: $947.50 Receipt Number MX 88943

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $947.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Case 472019CA000263CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Champion Mortgage Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINDHARDT , CHRISTOPHER CHARLES