This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 07/22/2019 at 23:00:49 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS SILVAS, AMANDA MARIE

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SILVAS, AMANDA MARIE. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SILVAS, AMANDA MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEHMANN, COLLEEN E

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED NON-SERVED ON AMANDA SILVAS

07/17/2019:SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED NON-SERVED ON AMANDA SILVAS

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR ISSUED FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATE OF FLORIDA-NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

07/01/2019:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR ISSUED FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATE OF FLORIDA-NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATE OF FLORIDA-NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT (PROPOSED)

06/28/2019:SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATE OF FLORIDA-NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT (PROPOSED)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/28/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/28/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED NON-SERVED ON AMANDA SILVAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR ISSUED FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO AMANDA SILVAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 8/15/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 86107

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO AMANDA SILVAS (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Case 472019SC000169SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Event Date: 08/15/2019 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX COURTROOM D

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEHMANN, COLLEEN E