This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 10/18/2019 at 23:01:24 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS AGUILAR, RAMON

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AGUILAR, RAMON. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

AGUILAR, RAMON

Okeechobee, FL 34974

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SUB-SERVED 10/9/2019 ON RAMON AGUILAR

10/10/2019:NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SUB-SERVED 10/9/2019 ON RAMON AGUILAR

SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO CARLY ENFINGER

09/25/2019:SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO CARLY ENFINGER

SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO RAMON AGUILAR (PROPOSED)

09/25/2019:SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO RAMON AGUILAR (PROPOSED)

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

09/25/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/25/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/25/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SUB-SERVED 10/9/2019 ON RAMON AGUILAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO CARLY ENFINGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 11/14/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO RAMON AGUILAR (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 89025

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Case 472019SC000267SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Event Date: 11/14/2019 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX COURTROOM D

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B