This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 10/31/2019 at 23:00:26 (UTC).

MARK TENNISWOOD DMD PA VS PERRY, CHRISTINA

Case Summary

On 10/07/2019 MARK TENNISWOOD DMD PA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PERRY, CHRISTINA. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARK TENNISWOOD DMD PA

Defendant

PERRY, CHRISTINA

Not Classified By Court

MARK TENNISWOOD

MARK TENNISWOOD DMD

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION

10/31/2019:STIPULATION

SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 10/9/2019 ON CHRISTINA PERRY

10/22/2019:SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 10/9/2019 ON CHRISTINA PERRY

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE ISSUED TO CHRISTINA PERRY

10/07/2019:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE ISSUED TO CHRISTINA PERRY

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/07/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 10/9/2019 ON CHRISTINA PERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Payment received: $90.00 Receipt Number MX 89479

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE ISSUED TO CHRISTINA PERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 1/16/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Case 472019SC000282SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/7/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Event Date: 01/16/2020 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX COURTROOM D

    Read MoreRead Less