This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 10/20/2019 at 23:01:03 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS MORSE, CALEB ROONEY

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MORSE, CALEB ROONEY. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MORSE, CALEB ROONEY

Okeechobee, FL 34974-4326

Not Classified By Court

MORSE, CALEB RODNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, JONATHAN ROBERT

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO CALEB MORSE

09/27/2019:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO CALEB MORSE

SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO CALEB MORSE (PROPOSED)

09/26/2019:SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO CALEB MORSE (PROPOSED)

NOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

09/26/2019:NOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/26/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO CALEB MORSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 11/14/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 89099

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO CALEB MORSE (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Case 472019SC000272SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Event Date: 11/14/2019 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX COURTROOM D

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Singer, Jonathan Robert, ESQ.