This case was last updated from Okeechobee County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/23/2022 at 13:38:19 (UTC).

LOPEZ CALDERON, MARIA FELICITA VS OPENING DOORS TO LIFE IN CARE Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 LOPEZ CALDERON, MARIA FELICITA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OPENING DOORS TO LIFE IN CARE. This case was filed in Okeechobee County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITE, REBECCA IVY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ CALDERON, MARIA FELICITA

Defendants

REYES, JUAN MANUEL

OPENING DOORS TO LIFE IN CARE

REYES, MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEE, FRANK HENRY

Defendant Attorney

GARCIA, FRANCISCO JAVIER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/25/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR CIVIL THEFT CONVERSION FRAUD MISREPRESENTATION AND FOR CANCELLATION OF DEED

05/25/2022:COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR CIVIL THEFT CONVERSION FRAUD MISREPRESENTATION AND FOR CANCELLATION OF DEED

SUMMONS TO JUAN MANUEL REYES (PROPOSED)

05/25/2022:SUMMONS TO JUAN MANUEL REYES (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO MARIA REYES (PROPOSED)

05/25/2022:SUMMONS TO MARIA REYES (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO OPENING DOORS TO LIFE C/O JUAN M REYES (PROPOSED)

05/25/2022:SUMMONS TO OPENING DOORS TO LIFE C/O JUAN M REYES (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JUAN MANUEL REYES

05/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JUAN MANUEL REYES

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARIA REYES

05/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARIA REYES

SUMMONS ISSUED TO OPENING DOORS TO LIFE C/O JUAN M REYES

05/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO OPENING DOORS TO LIFE C/O JUAN M REYES

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED TO JUAN MANUEL REYES ON 05/26/2022

05/27/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED TO JUAN MANUEL REYES ON 05/26/2022

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO MARIA REYES SUBSERVED TO JUAN REYES ON 05/26/2022

05/27/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO MARIA REYES SUBSERVED TO JUAN REYES ON 05/26/2022

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO OPENING DOORS TO LIFE C/O JUAN M REYES ON 05/26/2022

05/27/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO OPENING DOORS TO LIFE C/O JUAN M REYES ON 05/26/2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

06/14/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

06/14/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

AGREED STIPULATION OF PARTIES UPON DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO GRANT EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

06/15/2022:AGREED STIPULATION OF PARTIES UPON DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO GRANT EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

AGREED ORDER UPON DEFENDANTS REQUEST GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

06/15/2022:AGREED ORDER UPON DEFENDANTS REQUEST GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER UPON DEFENDANTS REQUEST GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED STIPULATION OF PARTIES UPON DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO GRANT EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO OPENING DOORS TO LIFE C/O JUAN M REYES ON 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO MARIA REYES SUBSERVED TO JUAN REYES ON 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED TO JUAN MANUEL REYES ON 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO OPENING DOORS TO LIFE C/O JUAN M REYES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO MARIA REYES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JUAN MANUEL REYES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO OPENING DOORS TO LIFE C/O JUAN M REYES (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO MARIA REYES (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO JUAN MANUEL REYES (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR CIVIL THEFT CONVERSION FRAUD MISREPRESENTATION AND FOR CANCELLATION OF DEED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number MX 117240

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCase 472022CA000114CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEE, FRANK HENRY III