This case was last updated from Okeechobee County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/21/2022 at 13:37:06 (UTC).

LOANDEPOTCOM LLC VS BENJAMIN M HAMRICK, UNKNOWN SP Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 LOANDEPOTCOM LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BENJAMIN M HAMRICK, UNKNOWN SP. This case was filed in Okeechobee County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITE, REBECCA IVY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOANDEPOTCOM LLC

Defendants

HAMRICK, BENJAMIN M

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPAR

LEGACY COURT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCI

IN POSSESSION 1, UNKNOWN TENAN

IN POSSESSION 2, UNKNOWN TENAN

PARTIES CLAIMING BY, ANY AND A

BENJAMIN M HAMRICK, UNKNOWN SP

Not Classified By Court

TERLEP, ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS, SARA BETH

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BENJAMIN M. HAMRICK

05/16/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BENJAMIN M. HAMRICK

AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE ON UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

05/16/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE ON UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE ON UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

05/16/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE ON UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS SERVED TO BENJAMIN M. HAMRICK 5/3/2022

05/16/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS SERVED TO BENJAMIN M. HAMRICK 5/3/2022

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTEMENT OF TREASURY- INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE C/O US ATTORNEY GENERAL C/O REGISTERED AGENT SERVED ON 05/04/2022

05/10/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTEMENT OF TREASURY- INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE C/O US ATTORNEY GENERAL C/O REGISTERED AGENT SERVED ON 05/04/2022

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED TO LEGACY COURT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC C/O GLORIA J. MILES ON 04/28/2022

05/10/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED TO LEGACY COURT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC C/O GLORIA J. MILES ON 04/28/2022

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE SERVED ON 04/28/2022

05/02/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE SERVED ON 04/28/2022

CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BENJAMIN M HAMRICK

04/21/2022:CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BENJAMIN M HAMRICK

CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

04/21/2022:CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT POSSESSION 1

04/21/2022:CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT POSSESSION 1

CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO LEGACY COURT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC CO GLORIA J MILES

04/21/2022:CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO LEGACY COURT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC CO GLORIA J MILES

CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE CO REIGISTERED AGENT

04/21/2022:CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE CO REIGISTERED AGENT

CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE CO US ATTORNEY GENERAL CO REGISTERED AGENT

04/21/2022:CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE CO US ATTORNEY GENERAL CO REGISTERED AGENT

CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO BENJAMIN M HAMRICK

04/21/2022:CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO BENJAMIN M HAMRICK

AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER (STANDARD TRACK) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER (PROPOSED)

04/21/2022:AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER (STANDARD TRACK) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER (PROPOSED)

CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS TO BENJAMIN M HAMRICK (PROPOSED)

04/21/2022:CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS TO BENJAMIN M HAMRICK (PROPOSED)

CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE CO US ATTORNEY GENERAL CO REGISTERED AGENT (PROPOSED)

04/21/2022:CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE CO US ATTORNEY GENERAL CO REGISTERED AGENT (PROPOSED)

CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS TO STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE CO REGISTERED AGENT (PROPOSED)

04/21/2022:CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS TO STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE CO REGISTERED AGENT (PROPOSED)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BENJAMIN M. HAMRICK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE ON UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE ON UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS SERVED TO BENJAMIN M. HAMRICK 5/3/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTEMENT OF TREASURY- INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE C/O US ATTORNEY GENERAL C/O REGISTERED AGENT SERVED ON 05/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED TO LEGACY COURT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC C/O GLORIA J. MILES ON 04/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE SERVED ON 04/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ACTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BENJAMIN M HAMRICK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ACTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ACTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT POSSESSION 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $990.00 Receipt Number MX 116107

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $990.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCase 472022CA000091CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOANDEPOTCOM LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARA B COLLINS, ESQ