This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 05/19/2022 at 07:26:31 (UTC).

KERNER, DEAN, KERNER, ROGER E Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 KERNER, DEAN, KERNER, ROGER E was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITE, REBECCA IVY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KERNER, DEAN

Claimants

LAWNWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENT

RIAZ MD, MOHAMMAD

Decedent

KERNER, ROGER E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CAMERON, COLIN MUNRO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketEstate Claim for $1,364.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM- LAWNWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketEstate Claim for $115.49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM- MOHAMMAD RIAZ MD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketRECORDED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESNTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMIISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 112353

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCase 472021CP000309CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/21/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAMERON, COLIN MUNRO