This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Okeechobee County on 10/20/2019 at 13:31:09 (UTC).

KERLEY, JOHN VS LIVINGSTON, DENNIS Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 KERLEY, JOHN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LIVINGSTON, DENNIS. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Okeechobee County, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KERLEY, JOHN

Defendants

PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS LLC

LIVINGSTON, DENNIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIFFIN, DYLAN HOUSTOUN

Defendant Attorney

SMITH, LAUREN J

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/14/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DENNIS LIVINGSTON

09/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO DENNIS LIVINGSTON

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC D/B/A PILOT/FLYING J #96 RA CT CORPORATION SYSTEM

09/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC D/B/A PILOT/FLYING J #96 RA CT CORPORATION SYSTEM

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC D/B/A PILOT/FLYING J #96

09/23/2019:NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC D/B/A PILOT/FLYING J #96

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT DENNIS LIVINGSTON

09/23/2019:NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT DENNIS LIVINGSTON

SUMMONS TO PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC D/B/A PILOT/FLYING J #96 RA CT CORPORATION SYSTEM (PROPOSED)

09/23/2019:SUMMONS TO PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC D/B/A PILOT/FLYING J #96 RA CT CORPORATION SYSTEM (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO DENNIS LIVINGSTON (PROPOSED)

09/23/2019:SUMMONS TO DENNIS LIVINGSTON (PROPOSED)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC D/B/A PILOT/FLYING J #96

09/23/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC D/B/A PILOT/FLYING J #96

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT DENNIS LIVINGSTON

09/23/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT DENNIS LIVINGSTON

COMPLAINT

09/23/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/23/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO DENNIS LIVINGSTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC D/B/A PILOT/FLYING J #96 RA CT CORPORATION SYSTEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC D/B/A PILOT/FLYING J #96

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT DENNIS LIVINGSTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC D/B/A PILOT/FLYING J #96 RA CT CORPORATION SYSTEM (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO DENNIS LIVINGSTON (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC D/B/A PILOT/FLYING J #96

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT DENNIS LIVINGSTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MX 88919

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Case 472019CA000262CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, LAUREN J